Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1942) 7808   Not applied
GER 506 m/e 10/1896
LNER (1924) 7506 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 2791 m/e 10/1946
BR 62791 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class E4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
E410/1896
Wheels 2-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number L37
To Service During 10/1896
Withdrawal Mon 04/04/1955
Scrapping During 08/1955
Service Life 58 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E Colchester 5w/e 24/03/1951
31A Cambridge 4w/e 15/11/1952
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 20/06/1953
31A Cambridge 4w/e 22/08/1953
   Withdrawn 04/04/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 30/07/1950
ALLOC 30E Colchester m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 08/08/1953
WDN   04/04/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Number Allocated Allocated number 7808 but not taken up    
10/1896 To Service To service as GER Number 506
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7506    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2791    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62791    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
22/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
04/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62791    

prev prev