Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1004 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7124 Week
» 18695 Month
» 266988 Year
» 1151369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1250 m/e 06/1902
LNER (1924) 7407 y/e 1924
LNER (1942) 7791 m/e 11/1942
LNER (1946) 2792 m/e 09/1946
BR 62792 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class E4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
E406/1902
Wheels 2-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number S50
To Service During 06/1902
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1956
Service Life 54 yrs , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/08/1955
   Withdrawn 18/06/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   18/06/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1902 To Service To service as GER Number 1250
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7407    
11/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 7791    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2792    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 62792    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
06/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 62792    

prev prev