Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1942) 7795   Not applied
GER 1257 m/e 07/1902
LNER (1924) 7414 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 2796 m/e 09/1946
BR 62796 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class E4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
E407/1902
Wheels 2-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number S50
To Service During 07/1902
Withdrawal Mon 13/05/1957
Service Life 54 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/08/1955
   Withdrawn 13/05/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   13/05/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Number Allocated Allocated number 7795 but not taken up    
07/1902 To Service To service as GER Number 1257
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7414    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2796    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 62796    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
05/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 62796    

prev prev