Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1336 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19139 Week
» 72155 Month
» 191682 Year
» 3218535 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7796 |
|
Not applied |
Great Eastern Railway |
1259 |
m/e |
08/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7416 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2797 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62797 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
E4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S50 |
To Service |
During 08/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/03/1958 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32C |
Lowestoft |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/03/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1942 |
L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) |
March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. |
SLS/194302 |
31/01/1958 |
Locomotive Statement |
4056 was the last ' Star' in service: 30738 remains the sole survivor of the 30736-55. series: 32331 was the last of the rebuilt 'Remembrance' N15IX class. Renewed scrapping of the GW. 90XX class has taken place: the NE. D20 class is now extinct: the, wholesale withdrawal of the D49 class appears to have begun. The V4 class is now extinct. Three G.E. ' Intermediates' (62785/8/97) are all that remain of this wheel-type. 52510 was the last Furness locomotive: 30688 was the first of its class to be scrapped, following an accident at Staines. The A7 class is now extinct: the first two A8 have been withdrawn. 47994 is the sole Garratt survivor. The GW. 31XX class is now reduced to five. All the remaining Rhymney and Taff. Vale engines have now gone: the LBSC E6 class is no longer intact: the first two NB N15 have been withdrawn: 30757 was the last representative of the PD & SWJR. Withdrawals of the GW 67XX, 77XX and 87XX have begun; the 54XX are rapidly disappearing: only two N.L. engines (58850/7) remain. The M.R. representatives now number four only. 30588 was the last of its class: 68126 was the last GE Y4 in capital stock. D-E. Standard shunters continue to be built very rapidly, Crewe and Doncaster having joined Derby and Darlington in their production. Further new classes of main line locomotives have appeared and several more are due for delivery early in 1958. D-M. Swindon has now joined the various contractors in turning out the standard small shunting type. These locos. will in future (with the exception of d11176) bear numbers in the D.2XXX series. |
SLS/195803 |
07/04/1958 |
Cambridge MPD |
With the withdrawal of 62788/97 in March, only one E4 remains-62785 and it was noted on the Mildenhall branch on 7th April. |
SLS/195805 |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7796 but not taken up |
|
|
08/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1259 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7416 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2797 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62797 |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
17/03/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62797 |
|
|
08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|