Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1587 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25218 Week
» 90172 Month
» 292836 Year
» 3319689 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
588 |
m/e |
06/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7588 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7160 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
67160 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
D63 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1907 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1950 |
Service Life |
42 yrs , 10 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/07/1949 |
Cambridge MPD |
On 10/7, the following were in store at Cambridge, in the goods yard behind the shed: 'C.12' No. 7354; 'E.4' No. 2785; 'F.3' No. 7124; 'F.4' Nos. 7160 an 7187. Four other 'E.4's' were in traffic, or on the shed, viz: Nos. 2783, 62788/91 an 2794. |
SLS/194908 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 588 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7588 |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7160 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bury St Edmunds (BSE) |
|
|
21/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 67160 but not taken up |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7160 |
|
|