Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3642 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17048 Week
» 70064 Month
» 189591 Year
» 3216444 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
185 |
m/e |
01/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7185 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7176 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67176 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A65 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 01/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 22/07/1953 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 185 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7185 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7176 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67176 |
|
|
11/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
22/07/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67176 |
|
|