Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3931 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17337 Week
» 70353 Month
» 189880 Year
» 3216733 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
188 |
m/e |
02/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7188 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7217 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
67217 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A65 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 02/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/11/1955 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
17/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 188 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7188 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7217 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67217 |
|
|
17/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
21/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67217 |
|
|