Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17929 Week
» 70945 Month
» 190472 Year
» 3217325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
79 |
m/e |
05/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7079 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7187 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67187 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
I65 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 18/08/1955 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/07/1949 |
Cambridge MPD |
On 10/7, the following were in store at Cambridge, in the goods yard behind the shed: 'C.12' No. 7354; 'E.4' No. 2785; 'F.3' No. 7124; 'F.4' Nos. 7160 an 7187. Four other 'E.4's' were in traffic, or on the shed, viz: Nos. 2783, 62788/91 an 2794. |
SLS/194908 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 79 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7079 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7187 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bury St Edmunds (BSE) |
|
|
23/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
07/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
09/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67187 |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
08/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
18/08/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67187 |
|
|