Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 816 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18619 Week
» 71635 Month
» 191162 Year
» 3218015 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
64 |
m/e |
05/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7064 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7223 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67223 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
F6 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G69 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/12/1955 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1911 |
YB |
|
Yarmouth Beach |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
32C |
|
Lowestoft |
4w/e |
24/10/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
13/12/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32C |
Lowestoft |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 64 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7064 |
|
|
09/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
09/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7223 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67223 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
13/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67223 |
|
|