Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1566 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19369 Week
» 72385 Month
» 191912 Year
» 3218765 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
66 |
m/e |
05/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7066 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7225 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67225 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
F6 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G69 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/05/1956 |
Service Life |
45 yrs , 28 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/05/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/05/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 66 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7066 |
|
|
09/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7225 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67225 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
28/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67225 |
|
|