Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 170 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17973 Week
» 70989 Month
» 190516 Year
» 3217369 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
68 |
m/e |
05/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7068 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7227 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
67227 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
F6 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G69 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 08/05/1958 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1938 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 68 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7068 |
|
|
10/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1938 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7227 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67227 |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
06/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
08/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67227 |
|
|