Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1536 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14942 Week
» 67958 Month
» 187485 Year
» 3214338 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7010 |
y/e |
c. 0 |
Great Eastern Railway |
10 |
m/e |
01/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7239 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
67239 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
F6 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A71 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 01/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 30/12/1955 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1912 |
KL |
|
Kings Lynn |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
IPS |
|
Ipswich |
m/e |
30/11/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/12/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
07/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7010 |
|
|
01/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 10 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
09/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7239 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67239 |
|
|
30/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67239 |
|
|