Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 169 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 169 Week
» 39215 Month
» 413228 Year
» 1634793 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1783 m/e 06/1894
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7246 m/e 01/1946
British Railways 67246 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A177
To Service During 06/1894
Withdrawal Thu 27/11/1958
Service Life 64 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1894
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52C Blaydon 5w/e 22/10/1955
56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 5w/e 19/01/1957
54A Sunderland 4w/e 16/02/1957
   Withdrawn on 27/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SBH Blyth (South) w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 26/01/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   on 27/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1894 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1783
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7246    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67246    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
27/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67246    

prev prev