Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 272 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2837 Week
» 1575 Month
» 415896 Year
» 1637461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1788 m/e 06/1894
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7247 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 67247 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A177
To Service During 06/1894
Withdrawal w/e Mon 06/12/1954
Service Life 60 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1894
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 06/12/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town 9w/e 31/03/1946
WDN   w/e 06/12/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1894 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1788
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7247    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67247    
06/12/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 67247    

prev prev