Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1778 m/e 02/1896
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7261 on 03/02/1946
British Railways 67261 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A201
To Service During 02/1896
Withdrawal Thu 11/12/1958
Service Life 62 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1896
SBH Blyth (South) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
53B Hull Botanic Gardens 5w/e 18/12/1954
52F Blyth (North) 5w/e 20/07/1957
54A Sunderland 5w/e 15/11/1958
   Withdrawn on 11/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 13/07/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   on 11/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted
01/1943 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1957 Newbiggin, Blyth And Monkseaton Branch G5 tanks 67261, 67281 an 67253 have been working on this branch during July and August. 67261 and 67281 have both been recently through Darlington Works for overhaul and repainting, 67261 having been reprieved from scrap. SLS/195709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1896 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1778
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/1943 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
03/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7261    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (South) (SBH)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67261    
18/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
11/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67261    

prev prev