Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 283 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2848 Week
» 1586 Month
» 415907 Year
» 1637472 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 529 m/e 06/1896
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7270 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 67270 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A209
To Service During 06/1896
Withdrawal Mon 13/01/1958
Service Life 61 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1896
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52B Heaton 4w/e 21/07/1951
52A Gateshead 5w/e 21/06/1952
52B Heaton 4w/e 19/07/1952
52D Tweedmouth 5w/e 21/03/1953
52C Blaydon 4w/e 22/05/1954
54A Sunderland 4w/e 21/04/1956
   Withdrawn on 13/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 52D Tweedmouth 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 52CHEX   4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 5w/e 31/03/1956
WDN   on 13/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1896 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 529
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7270    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67270    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
13/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67270    

prev prev