Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 252 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2817 Week
» 1555 Month
» 415876 Year
» 1637441 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2081 m/e 10/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7310 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67310 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A281
To Service During 10/1900
Withdrawal Tue 06/09/1955
Service Life 54 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1900
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52B Heaton 4w/e 21/07/1951
   Withdrawn on 06/09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 54A Sunderland w/e 17/11/1951
WDN   on 06/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1900 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2081
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7310    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67310    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
06/09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67310    

prev prev