Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 160 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 160 Week
» 39206 Month
» 413219 Year
» 1634784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2086 m/e 12/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7315 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 67315 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A281
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal Thu 11/12/1958
Service Life 58 yrs , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1900
BLA Blaydon on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52C Blaydon 4w/e 20/06/1953
52A Gateshead 5w/e 24/04/1954
54A Sunderland 5w/e 24/07/1954
52F Blyth (North) 5w/e 23/07/1955
50F Malton 4w/e 21/04/1956
   Withdrawn on 11/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 52CHEX   5w/e 27/02/1954
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   on 11/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/03/1953 Alston Branch The 2.0 p.m. train to Haltwhistle was in charge of G5 67315 of 52C, While J39 No. 64814, also of 52C, was outside the shed. Quite a fair amount of freight appears to move over the branch in addition to the six passenger trips each way, with an extra in both directions on Saturdays. SLS/195304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2086
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7315    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67315    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Malton (50F)    
11/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67315    

prev prev