Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 106 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4066 Week
» 33652 Month
» 407665 Year
» 1629230 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2087 m/e 12/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7316 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67316 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A281
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal Tue 13/12/1955
Service Life 55 yrs , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1900
WHL West Hartlepool on 01/01/1948
51A Darlington 4w/e 25/11/1950
51C West Hartlepool 5w/e 23/06/1951
52C Blaydon 4w/e 21/07/1951
54A Sunderland 5w/e 23/07/1955
   Withdrawn on 13/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51A Darlington on 29/10/1950
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 52CHEX   w/e 21/07/1951
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   on 13/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2087
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7316    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67316    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
13/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67316    

prev prev