Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18135 Week
» 71151 Month
» 190678 Year
» 3217531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2096 |
m/e |
03/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7325 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
67325 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A281 |
To Service |
During 03/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 10/10/1958 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
w/e |
31/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
w/e |
19/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
50F |
Malton |
3w/e |
21/04/1956 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Neville Hill |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1901 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2096 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7325 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67325 |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
10/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67325 |
|
|