Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 36 Online
» 4267 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19879 Week
» 118524 Month
» 321188 Year
» 3348041 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2097 |
m/e |
03/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7326 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67326 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A281 |
To Service |
During 03/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 08/10/1957 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
53D |
Bridlington |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/10/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1901 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2097 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
07/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7326 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (South) (SBH) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67326 |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bridlington (53D) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67326 |
|
|