Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 258 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2823 Week
» 1561 Month
» 415882 Year
» 1637447 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 540 m/e 06/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7333 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 67333 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A---
To Service During 06/1901
Withdrawal Mon 08/10/1956
Service Life 55 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1901
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51J Northallerton 5w/e 23/06/1951
51A Darlington 5w/e 16/02/1952
51C West Hartlepool 5w/e 23/08/1952
54A Sunderland 4w/e 21/04/1956
   Withdrawn on 08/10/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AUK West Auckland w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC DAR Darlington w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 51J Northallerton w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 5w/e 31/03/1956
WDN   on 08/10/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1901 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 540
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7333    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67333    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Northallerton (51J)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
08/10/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67333    

prev prev