Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 317 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2882 Week
» 1620 Month
» 415941 Year
» 1637506 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 580 m/e 06/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7334 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 67334 on 08/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A---
To Service During 06/1901
Withdrawal Mon 26/03/1956
Service Life 54 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1901
SBH Blyth (South) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
54A Sunderland 5w/e 23/07/1955
   Withdrawn on 26/03/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   on 26/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1901 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 580
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7334    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (South) (SBH)    
08/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67334    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
26/03/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67334    

prev prev