Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 84 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4044 Week
» 33630 Month
» 407643 Year
» 1629208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 149 m/e 09/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7338 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 67338 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A---
To Service During 09/1901
Withdrawal Tue 27/08/1957
Service Life 55 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1901
MID Middlesbrough on 01/01/1948
51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 23/10/1954
54A Sunderland 5w/e 17/12/1955
   Withdrawn on 27/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 31/12/1955
WDN   on 27/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1939 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1901 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 149
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/1939 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7338    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Middlesbrough (MID)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67338    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
27/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67338    

prev prev