Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 103 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4063 Week
» 33649 Month
» 407662 Year
» 1629227 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 408 m/e 10/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7342 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67342 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A---
To Service During 10/1901
Withdrawal Tue 02/12/1958
Service Life 57 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1901
DAR Darlington on 01/01/1948
51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 21/07/1951
51F West Auckland 5w/e 16/02/1952
51J Northallerton 4w/e 15/11/1952
54A Sunderland 5w/e 17/12/1955
50F Malton 4w/e 08/03/1958
   Withdrawn on 02/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool w/e 21/07/1951
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 51J Northallerton 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 50F Malton 4w/e 22/03/1958
WDN   on 02/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1901 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 408
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7342    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67342    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Northallerton (51J)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
08/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Malton (50F)    
02/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67342    

prev prev