Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 413 m/e 10/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7343 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67343 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A---
To Service During 10/1901
Withdrawal Mon 04/11/1957
Service Life 56 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1901
WHL West Hartlepool on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51A Darlington 5w/e 23/08/1952
51E Stockton 4w/e 25/07/1953
51C West Hartlepool 5w/e 24/07/1954
54A Sunderland 5w/e 24/03/1956
   Withdrawn on 04/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 5w/e 31/03/1956
WDN   on 04/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1901 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 413
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7343    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67343    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
04/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67343    

prev prev