Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 91 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4051 Week
» 33637 Month
» 407650 Year
» 1629215 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 433 m/e 11/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7345 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 67345 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A---
To Service During 11/1901
Withdrawal Tue 13/12/1955
Service Life 54 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1901
AUK West Auckland on 01/01/1948
51E Stockton 5w/e 23/06/1951
51A Darlington 4w/e 25/07/1953
51J Northallerton 4w/e 20/03/1954
54A Sunderland 4w/e 22/05/1954
   Withdrawn on 13/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AUK West Auckland on 13/04/1947
ALLOC 51E Stockton w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 51J Northallerton 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 22/05/1954
WDN   on 13/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1901 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 433
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7345    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67345    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
20/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Northallerton (51J)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
13/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67345    

prev prev