Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 82 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4042 Week
» 33628 Month
» 407641 Year
» 1629206 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 437 m/e 11/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7348 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 67348 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A---
To Service During 11/1901
Withdrawal w/e Mon 12/01/1953
Service Life 51 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1901
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 12/01/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 21/12/1946
WDN   w/e 12/01/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 General At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock SLS/194701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1901 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 437
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 7348    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67348    
12/01/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 67348    

prev prev