Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 268 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2833 Week
» 1571 Month
» 415892 Year
» 1637457 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 2143 m/e 10/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9850   28/09/1946
British Railways 69850   17/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H110/1913
A805/12/1933
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 10/1913 to Neville Hill (NEV)
Withdrawal Tue 21/06/1960 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 08/1960
Service Life 46 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 21/6/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEV Neville Hill (New) m/e 10/1913
MID Middlesbrough on 12/06/1933
BLA Blaydon on 18/01/1939
SUN Sunderland on 31/10/1941
   Withdrawn on 21/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   on 21/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1913 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D245)
07/08/1921 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1107)
30/09/1931 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1091)
22/06/1935 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1063)
29/10/1937 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1106)
30/12/1939 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3059)
04/08/1942 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3046)
27/05/1944 Diagram 63C boiler fitted (number 2827)
28/09/1946 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3367)
17/09/1949 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3984)
03/02/1955 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24710)
24/08/1957 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24737)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 1921 08/1921   General  
Darlington Works 27/02/1923 24/05/1923 87 days General  
Darlington Works 12/03/1924 16/05/1924 66 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 31/03/1925 18/08/1925 141 days General  
Darlington Works 11/11/1927 28/02/1928 110 days General  
Darlington Works 30/01/1929 08/03/1929 38 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 24/04/1930 19/07/1930 87 days General  
Darlington Works 23/07/1930 02/08/1930 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/08/1931 30/09/1931 45 days Heavy
Boiler number D1091 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 20/04/1933 05/12/1933 230 days Rebuilding  
Darlington Works 01/04/1935 22/06/1935 83 days General
Boiler number D1063 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 13/09/1937 29/10/1937 47 days General
Boiler number D1106 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 10/11/1937 26/11/1937 17 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/11/1937 15/12/1937 16 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/01/1938 14/01/1938 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/02/1938 31/03/1938 37 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/11/1939 30/12/1939 43 days General
Boiler number 3059 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 26/06/1942 04/08/1942 40 days General
Boiler number 3046 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 11/01/1944 04/02/1944 25 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 29/04/1944 27/05/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C)
 
Darlington Works 28/08/1946 28/09/1946 32 days General
Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9850
 
Gateshead Works 15/09/1947 30/09/1947 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 10/08/1949 17/09/1949 39 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24717 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69850
 
Darlington Works 09/09/1949 01/10/1949 23 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/07/1951 14/07/1951 6 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 19/02/1952 20/03/1952 31 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 04/05/1953 30/05/1953 27 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 03/01/1955 03/02/1955 32 days General
Boiler number 24710 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 14/02/1955 24/02/1955 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/03/1955 11/03/1955 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/07/1957 24/08/1957 27 days General
Boiler number 24737 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 26/08/1957 28/08/1957 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/09/1957 12/09/1957 4 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1959 Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1913 To Service      
07/08/1921 Modification Diagram 63 number D1107 boiler fitted    
12/06/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
18/01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
31/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN)    
21/06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69850 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev