|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1921 | 08/1921 | General | ||||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1923 | 24/05/1923 | 87 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1924 | 16/05/1924 | 66 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1925 | 18/08/1925 | 141 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1927 | 28/02/1928 | 110 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1929 | 08/03/1929 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1930 | 19/07/1930 | 87 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/07/1930 | 02/08/1930 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1931 | 30/09/1931 | 45 days | Heavy | Boiler number D1091 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1933 | 05/12/1933 | 230 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1935 | 22/06/1935 | 83 days | General | Boiler number D1063 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1937 | 29/10/1937 | 47 days | General | Boiler number D1106 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1937 | 26/11/1937 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1937 | 15/12/1937 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1938 | 14/01/1938 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1938 | 31/03/1938 | 37 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1939 | 30/12/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3059 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1942 | 04/08/1942 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3046 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1944 | 04/02/1944 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1946 | 28/09/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9850 |
||
Gateshead Works | 15/09/1947 | 30/09/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1949 | 17/09/1949 | 39 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24717 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69850 |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1949 | 01/10/1949 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1951 | 14/07/1951 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1952 | 20/03/1952 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1953 | 30/05/1953 | 27 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1955 | 03/02/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24710 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1955 | 24/02/1955 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1955 | 11/03/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1957 | 24/08/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24737 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1957 | 28/08/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1957 | 12/09/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2143 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/08/1921. | ||
07/08/1921 | Modification | Diagram 63 number D1107 boiler fitted | ||
27/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1923. Dep: 24/05/1923. | ||
12/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/03/1924. Dep: 16/05/1924. | ||
31/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1925. Dep: 18/08/1925. | ||
11/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1927. Dep: 28/02/1928. | ||
30/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1929. Dep: 08/03/1929. | ||
24/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1930. Dep: 19/07/1930. | ||
23/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/07/1930. Dep: 02/08/1930. | ||
17/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/08/1931. Dep: 30/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1091 (Diagram 63) |
||
20/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 20/04/1933. Dep: 05/12/1933. | ||
12/06/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
01/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1935. Dep: 22/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1063 (Diagram 63) |
||
13/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1937. Dep: 29/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1106 (Diagram 63) |
||
10/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1937. Dep: 26/11/1937. | ||
30/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1937. Dep: 15/12/1937. | ||
03/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1938. Dep: 14/01/1938. | ||
23/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1938. Dep: 31/03/1938. | ||
18/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
18/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 30/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3059 (Diagram 63B) |
||
31/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
26/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1942. Dep: 04/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3046 (Diagram 63B) |
||
11/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1944. Dep: 04/02/1944. | ||
29/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C) |
||
28/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9850 |
||
15/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1947. Dep: 30/09/1947. | ||
10/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1949. Dep: 17/09/1949. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24717 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69850 |
||
09/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949. | ||
09/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/07/1951. Dep: 14/07/1951. | ||
19/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/02/1952. Dep: 20/03/1952. | ||
04/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953. | ||
03/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1955. Dep: 03/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24710 (Diagram 63B) |
||
14/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1955. Dep: 24/02/1955. | ||
07/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1955. Dep: 11/03/1955. | ||
29/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1957. Dep: 24/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24737 (Diagram 63B) |
||
26/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/08/1957. Dep: 28/08/1957. | ||
09/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1957. Dep: 12/09/1957. | ||
21/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69850 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
08/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |