Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 286 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2851 Week
» 1589 Month
» 415910 Year
» 1637475 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 2144 m/e 10/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9851   20/10/1946
British Railways 69851   15/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H110/1913
A826/03/1935
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 10/1913 to Saltburn (SALT)
Withdrawal Tue 11/11/1958 off West Auckland (51F)
Scrapping During 07/1959
Service Life 45 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 11/11/58

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SALT Saltburn (New) m/e 10/1913
GHD Gateshead on 28/05/1928
TDK Tyne Dock on 09/07/1938
GHD Gateshead on 17/09/1938
SUN Sunderland on 14/11/1938
BLA Blaydon on 18/01/1939
51F West Auckland on 28/05/1950
   Withdrawn on 11/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51F West Auckland on 28/05/1950
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   on 11/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1913 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D250)
07/05/1922 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D245)
29/04/1932 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1282)
01/10/1937 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number 2373)
02/09/1941 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number 2375)
16/09/1944 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1251)
07/11/1947 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3050)
23/02/1951 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24755)
23/07/1955 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24758)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 1922 05/1922   General  
Darlington Works 11/01/1924 26/03/1924 76 days General  
Darlington Works 26/01/1926 18/06/1926 144 days General  
Darlington Works 14/10/1927 23/01/1928 102 days General  
Gateshead Works 08/11/1929 13/01/1930 67 days General  
Gateshead Works 22/03/1932 29/04/1932 39 days General
Boiler number D1282 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 16/01/1935 26/03/1935 70 days Rebuilding  
Darlington Works 17/08/1937 01/10/1937 46 days General
Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 06/06/1939 20/07/1939 45 days General  
Darlington Works 29/11/1940 21/01/1941 54 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 22/07/1941 02/09/1941 43 days General
Boiler number 2375 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 08/09/1941 13/09/1941 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/05/1943 11/06/1943 23 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 11/08/1944 16/09/1944 37 days General
Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 28/01/1946 14/02/1946 18 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/11/1946 06/12/1946 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 03/10/1947 07/11/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3050 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 11/11/1947 14/11/1947 4 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 26/10/1949 15/12/1949 51 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 69851
 
Darlington Works 30/01/1951 23/02/1951 25 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24755 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 05/03/1951 09/03/1951 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/05/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 12/02/1953 27/06/1953 136 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 29/06/1953 03/07/1953 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/06/1955 23/07/1955 30 days General
Boiler number 24758 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 25/07/1955 29/07/1955 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/11/1956 11/12/1956 22 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 15/01/1957 28/01/1957 14 days Light Casual
After collision
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1913 To Service      
07/05/1922 Modification Diagram 63 number D245 boiler fitted    
28/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
09/07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
17/09/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
14/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN)    
18/01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9851    
28/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
11/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69851 from West Auckland (51F)    

prev prev