Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 313 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2878 Week
» 1616 Month
» 415937 Year
» 1637502 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 2145 m/e 11/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9852   20/10/1946
British Railways 69852   27/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H111/1913
A802/1936
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1913 to Saltburn (SALT)
Withdrawal Wed 04/11/1959 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 46 yrs , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 15/11/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SALT Saltburn (New) m/e 11/1913
MID Middlesbrough on 16/05/1929
HTN Heaton on 26/06/1930
SKN Stockton on 04/07/1938
SBK Starbeck on 28/02/1940
WBY Whitby on 12/03/1945
51C West Hartlepool on 04/06/1950
51E Stockton on 06/07/1952
51D Middlesbrough on 05/10/1952
51K Saltburn on 19/09/1954
54A Sunderland on 15/09/1957
   Withdrawn on 04/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 51K Saltburn 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 05/10/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   on 04/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1913 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D252)
07/06/1929 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D306)
31/01/1934 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1199)
29/02/1936 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2664)
18/01/1939 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2458)
27/05/1943 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1316)
08/12/1945 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3374)
03/02/1951 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24697)
24/12/1953 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24756)
13/08/1956 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24740)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 06/12/1922 24/02/1923 81 days General  
Darlington Works 24/01/1924 28/03/1924 65 days General  
Darlington Works 23/11/1925 27/04/1926 156 days General  
Darlington Works 20/09/1927 30/12/1927 102 days General  
Darlington Works 25/03/1929 07/06/1929 75 days General
Boiler number D306 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 20/06/1930 31/07/1930 42 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 05/08/1930 18/08/1930 14 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 10/11/1931 21/12/1931 42 days General  
Darlington Works 22/12/1933 31/01/1934 41 days General
Boiler number D1199 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 10/12/1935 29/02/1936 82 days Rebuilding
Boiler number 2664 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 08/11/1938 18/01/1939 72 days General
Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 26/01/1939 06/02/1939 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/07/1939 04/08/1939 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/05/1941 31/05/1941 18 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 27/04/1943 27/05/1943 31 days General
Boiler number D1316 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 14/11/1944 09/12/1944 26 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 31/10/1945 08/12/1945 39 days General
Boiler number 3374 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 09/04/1948 27/08/1948 141 days General
Renumbered to BR 69852
 
Darlington Works 01/01/1951 03/02/1951 34 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24697 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 25/11/1953 24/12/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 24756 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 05/01/1954 06/01/1954 2 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 12/07/1955 03/08/1955 23 days Light Casual  
Gateshead Works 21/11/1955 23/12/1955 33 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 26/06/1956 13/08/1956 49 days General
Boiler number 24740 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 23/11/1956 06/12/1956 14 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 11/02/1957 27/02/1957 17 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 12/06/1957 03/07/1957 22 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 02/08/1957 23/08/1957 22 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808
31/10/1957 Sunderland MPD This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. SLS/195711
31/05/1959 Class A8 4-6-2T (Borough Gardens) All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1913 To Service      
16/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
26/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
04/07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
28/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK)    
12/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (WBY)    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9852    
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
06/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
19/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (51K)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
04/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69852 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev