|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/12/1922 | 24/02/1923 | 81 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1924 | 28/03/1924 | 65 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1925 | 27/04/1926 | 156 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1927 | 30/12/1927 | 102 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1929 | 07/06/1929 | 75 days | General | Boiler number D306 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1930 | 31/07/1930 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1930 | 18/08/1930 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/11/1931 | 21/12/1931 | 42 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/12/1933 | 31/01/1934 | 41 days | General | Boiler number D1199 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1935 | 29/02/1936 | 82 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number 2664 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1938 | 18/01/1939 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1939 | 06/02/1939 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/07/1939 | 04/08/1939 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1941 | 31/05/1941 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1943 | 27/05/1943 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1316 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3374 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1948 | 27/08/1948 | 141 days | General | Renumbered to BR 69852 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/01/1951 | 03/02/1951 | 34 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24697 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1953 | 24/12/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24756 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1954 | 06/01/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/07/1955 | 03/08/1955 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/11/1955 | 23/12/1955 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1956 | 13/08/1956 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 24740 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1956 | 06/12/1956 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1957 | 27/02/1957 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1957 | 03/07/1957 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1957 | 23/08/1957 | 22 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
31/10/1957 | Sunderland MPD | This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. | SLS/195711 |
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Borough Gardens) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2145 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Saltburn (SALT) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
06/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1922. Dep: 24/02/1923. | ||
24/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1924. Dep: 28/03/1924. | ||
23/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1925. Dep: 27/04/1926. | ||
20/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1927. Dep: 30/12/1927. | ||
25/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1929. Dep: 07/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D306 (Diagram 63) |
||
16/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
20/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1930. Dep: 31/07/1930. | ||
26/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
05/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1930. Dep: 18/08/1930. | ||
10/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1931. Dep: 21/12/1931. | ||
22/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1933. Dep: 31/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1199 (Diagram 63) |
||
10/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 10/12/1935. Dep: 29/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2664 (Diagram 63A) |
||
04/07/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
08/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1938. Dep: 18/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A) |
||
26/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/01/1939. Dep: 06/02/1939. | ||
24/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/07/1939. Dep: 04/08/1939. | ||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
14/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/05/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941. | ||
27/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1943. Dep: 27/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1316 (Diagram 63) |
||
14/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. | ||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
31/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3374 (Diagram 63B) |
||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9852 | ||
09/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1948. Dep: 27/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69852 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
01/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1951. Dep: 03/02/1951. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24697 (Diagram 63B) |
||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
25/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1953. Dep: 24/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24756 (Diagram 63B) |
||
05/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/01/1954. Dep: 06/01/1954. | ||
19/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
12/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/07/1955. Dep: 03/08/1955. | ||
21/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1955. Dep: 23/12/1955. | ||
26/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1956. Dep: 13/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24740 (Diagram 63B) |
||
23/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1956. Dep: 06/12/1956. | ||
11/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1957. Dep: 27/02/1957. | ||
12/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1957. Dep: 03/07/1957. | ||
02/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/08/1957. Dep: 23/08/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
04/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69852 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
12/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |