Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 263 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2828 Week
» 1566 Month
» 415887 Year
» 1637452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 2146 m/e 11/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9853   20/10/1946
British Railways 69853   02/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H111/1913
A809/05/1935
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1913 to Saltburn (SALT)
Withdrawal Mon 25/01/1960 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 15/2/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SALT Saltburn (New) m/e 11/1913
GHD Gateshead on 28/05/1928
BLA Blaydon on 17/01/1939
SUN Sunderland on 30/05/1948
   Withdrawn on 25/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SUN Sunderland w/e 05/06/1948
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   w/e 25/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1913 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D254)
30/07/1927 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D256)
29/03/1933 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2455)
19/12/1939 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3056)
01/04/1942 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3031)
26/08/1944 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3361)
08/02/1947 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3065)
02/09/1949 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3036)
29/12/1951 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24726)
03/04/1954 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24695)
06/12/1956 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24736)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 10/01/1924 29/03/1924 80 days General  
Darlington Works 04/09/1925 17/12/1925 105 days General  
Darlington Works 01/04/1927 30/07/1927 121 days General
Boiler number D256 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 18/08/1927 06/09/1927 20 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 20/06/1929 21/08/1929 63 days General  
Gateshead Works 03/02/1931 26/03/1931 52 days General  
Darlington Works 19/01/1933 29/03/1933 70 days General
Boiler number 2455 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 11/02/1935 09/05/1935 88 days Rebuilding  
Darlington Works 22/09/1937 11/11/1937 51 days General  
Darlington Works 18/11/1939 19/12/1939 32 days General
Boiler number 24745 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 17/02/1942 01/04/1942 44 days General
Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 10/07/1942 17/07/1942 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/07/1944 26/08/1944 53 days General
Boiler number 3361 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 28/12/1946 08/02/1947 43 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 3065 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 11/02/1947 18/02/1947 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/08/1949 02/09/1949 29 days General
Boiler number 3036 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69853
 
Darlington Works 27/11/1951 29/12/1951 33 days General
Boiler number 24726 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1954 03/04/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 24695 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 06/11/1956 06/12/1956 31 days General
Boiler number 24736 (Diagram 63B)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611
20/07/1957 Durham Miners\' Gala Saturday, 20th July. Special trains were run from Waterhouses to Durham on which line passenger traffic does not normally run. Special trains were also run from Usworth Colliery and Washington to Durham and a greatly augmented service operated from Sunderland. 17 locomotives of types J39, K1 and ex-LMS class 4MT were borrowed by Sunderland shed from neighbouring sheds to operate the traffic. On the Waterhouses branch, J39 64936 and A8 69853 were observed. Newcastle-D20 62395 has been regularly working trains to Alnwick during July. J27 65781 (54A) has been observed repainted with the new emblem. SLS/195709
31/05/1959 Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1913 To Service      
28/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
17/01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9853    
30/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN)    
25/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69853 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev