Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 121 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4081 Week
» 33667 Month
» 407680 Year
» 1629245 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 2147 m/e 12/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9854 on 10/02/1946
British Railways 69854   18/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H112/1913
A831/08/1933
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1913 to Neville Hill (NEV)
Withdrawal Tue 10/05/1960 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 05/1960
Service Life 46 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 10/5/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEV Neville Hill (New) m/e 12/1913
WBY Whitby on 31/08/1933
NEV Neville Hill on 11/10/1933
DAR Darlington on 27/06/1934
MID Middlesbrough on 20/03/1939
AUK West Auckland on 01/01/1940
MID Middlesbrough on 14/02/1942
HLB Hull Botanic Gardens on 12/01/1946
MID Middlesbrough on 27/06/1948
53B Hull Botanic Gardens on 04/06/1950
51D Middlesbrough on 19/11/1950
54A Sunderland on 15/09/1957
   Withdrawn on 10/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MID Middlesbrough w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 05/10/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   on 10/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1913 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D256)
19/01/1926 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D300)
22/01/1930 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1316)
05/07/1935 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1301)
24/12/1937 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1208)
04/11/1939 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 115)
15/12/1945 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number 2377)
15/03/1951 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24703)
28/09/1956 Diagram 63BSup boiler fitted (number 24709)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 19/12/1923 08/03/1924 81 days General  
Darlington Works 14/04/1924 29/04/1924 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 06/11/1925 29/01/1926 85 days General
Boiler number D300 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 10/10/1927 11/01/1928 94 days General  
Darlington Works 19/03/1929 16/04/1929 29 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/11/1929 22/01/1930 59 days General
Boiler number D1316 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 11/01/1933 31/08/1933 233 days Rebuilding  
Darlington Works 31/05/1935 05/07/1935 36 days General
Boiler number D1301 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 09/07/1935 19/07/1935 11 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 30/08/1935 24/09/1935 26 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 30/09/1935 13/12/1935 75 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/11/1937 24/12/1937 47 days General
Boiler number D1208 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 03/10/1939 04/11/1939 33 days General
Boiler number 115 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 19/07/1940 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 09/09/1940 09/10/1940 31 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 15/12/1942 21/01/1943 38 days General
Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 18/09/1944 19/10/1944 32 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 14/11/1945 15/12/1945 32 days General
Boiler number 2377 (Diagram 63)
 
Gateshead Works 09/01/1947 23/01/1947 15 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 21/01/1948 18/06/1948 150 days General
Renumbered to BR 69854
 
Gateshead Works 04/02/1949 25/02/1949 22 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 16/05/1950 08/06/1950 24 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 13/02/1951 15/03/1951 31 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24703 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 09/07/1952 03/09/1952 57 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 08/06/1953 20/06/1953 13 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 01/12/1953 31/12/1953 31 days General
Boiler number 24724 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 29/08/1956 28/09/1956 31 days General
Boiler number 24709 (Diagram 63BSup)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808
31/10/1957 Sunderland MPD This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. SLS/195711
31/05/1959 Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1913 To Service      
19/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1923. Dep: 08/03/1924.    
14/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/04/1924. Dep: 29/04/1924.    
06/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1925. Dep: 29/01/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D300 (Diagram 63)
   
10/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1927. Dep: 11/01/1928.    
19/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1929. Dep: 16/04/1929.    
25/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1929. Dep: 22/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1316 (Diagram 63)
   
11/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 11/01/1933. Dep: 31/08/1933.    
31/08/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (WBY)    
11/10/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
27/06/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
31/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1935. Dep: 05/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1301 (Diagram 63)
   
09/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/07/1935. Dep: 19/07/1935.    
30/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/08/1935. Dep: 24/09/1935.    
30/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/09/1935. Dep: 13/12/1935.    
08/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1937. Dep: 24/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1208 (Diagram 63)
   
20/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
03/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 115 (Diagram 63A)
   
01/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK)    
19/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 19/07/1940.    
09/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/09/1940. Dep: 09/10/1940.    
14/02/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
15/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1942. Dep: 21/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A)
   
18/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1944. Dep: 19/10/1944.    
14/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2377 (Diagram 63)
   
12/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB)    
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9854    
09/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/01/1947. Dep: 23/01/1947.    
21/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1948. Dep: 18/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 69854
   
27/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
04/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1949. Dep: 25/02/1949.    
16/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1950. Dep: 08/06/1950.    
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
19/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
13/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1951. Dep: 15/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24703 (Diagram 63B)
   
09/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/07/1952. Dep: 03/09/1952.    
08/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/06/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
01/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 31/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24724 (Diagram 63B)
   
29/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1956. Dep: 28/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24709 (Diagram 63BSup)
   
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
10/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69854 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev