|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/02/1923 | 17/05/1923 | 84 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1923 | 29/08/1923 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1925 | 13/07/1925 | 132 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1925 | 31/07/1925 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1925 | 31/08/1925 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1927 | 28/06/1927 | 91 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/02/1929 | 16/04/1929 | 57 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/11/1930 | 21/01/1931 | 58 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/01/1931 | 17/02/1931 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/07/1932 | 04/08/1932 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1933 | 22/12/1933 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 2467 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1936 | 26/03/1936 | 70 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1938 | 04/08/1938 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2377 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1939 | 10/10/1939 | 67 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1940 | 18/07/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number D1282 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1943 | 18/12/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 113 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1944 | 06/02/1945 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1946 | 20/07/1946 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2457 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9855 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1948 | 22/10/1948 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2664 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69855 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1948 | 24/11/1948 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1950 | 21/10/1950 | 33 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24687 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1952 | 24/03/1952 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1952 | 14/02/1953 | 195 days | General | Boiler number 24742 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1953 | 19/02/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1953 | 15/07/1953 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1954 | 19/11/1954 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1955 | 26/03/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24730 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1955 | 30/03/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1955 | 15/12/1955 | 13 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1956 | 16/11/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24693 (Diagram 63C) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1957 | 27/03/1957 | 17 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1957 | Sunderland MPD | This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. | SLS/195711 |
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2148 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Saltburn (SALT) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
23/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1923. Dep: 17/05/1923. | ||
14/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/08/1923. Dep: 29/08/1923. | ||
04/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1925. Dep: 13/07/1925. | ||
27/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/07/1925. Dep: 31/07/1925. | ||
10/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1925. Dep: 31/08/1925. | ||
30/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1927. Dep: 28/06/1927. | ||
28/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
19/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1929. Dep: 16/04/1929. | ||
25/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1930. Dep: 21/01/1931. | ||
29/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/01/1931. Dep: 17/02/1931. | ||
19/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/07/1932. Dep: 04/08/1932. | ||
06/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1933. Dep: 22/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2467 (Diagram 63A) |
||
19/06/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
28/06/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
17/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 17/01/1936. Dep: 26/03/1936. | ||
20/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1938. Dep: 04/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2377 (Diagram 63) |
||
05/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1939. Dep: 10/10/1939. | ||
20/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1940. Dep: 18/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1282 (Diagram 63) |
||
13/10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
19/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 113 (Diagram 63A) |
||
19/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1944. Dep: 06/02/1945. | ||
17/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2457 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9855 |
||
18/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1948. Dep: 22/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2664 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69855 |
||
11/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1948. Dep: 24/11/1948. | ||
19/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1950. Dep: 21/10/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24687 (Diagram 63A) |
||
19/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
25/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
30/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/01/1952. | ||
03/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1952. Dep: 24/03/1952. | ||
04/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1952. Dep: 14/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24742 (Diagram 63B) |
||
16/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1953. Dep: 19/02/1953. | ||
02/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1953. Dep: 15/07/1953. | ||
15/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1954. Dep: 19/11/1954. | ||
28/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24730 (Diagram 63B) |
||
28/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1955. Dep: 30/03/1955. | ||
03/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/12/1955. Dep: 15/12/1955. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
12/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1956. Dep: 16/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24693 (Diagram 63C) |
||
11/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/03/1957. Dep: 27/03/1957. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
25/01/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69855 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
02/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |