|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/09/1923 | 19/11/1923 | 78 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1925 | 22/12/1925 | 99 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1927 | 25/11/1927 | 78 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/09/1929 | 12/11/1929 | 51 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/09/1931 | 09/10/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1933 | 26/10/1933 | 38 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1935 | 14/06/1935 | 96 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1937 | 10/08/1937 | 64 days | General | Boiler number D1267 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1937 | 24/08/1937 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1939 | 01/02/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1941 | 29/11/1941 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1942 | 02/12/1942 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1944 | 25/04/1944 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1945 | 11/08/1945 | 146 days | General | Boiler number 117 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/11/1946 | 06/12/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 01/01/1948 | 23/03/1948 | 83 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1948 | 09/07/1948 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3898 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69857 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1951 | 21/04/1951 | 33 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24708 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1953 | 10/10/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24685 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1953 | 13/10/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1954 | 23/09/1954 | 43 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1956 | 07/11/1956 | 35 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1957 | 06/12/1957 | 15 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
15/09/1956 | Sunderland MPD | On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. | SLS/195611 |
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1914 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2150 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Saltburn (SALT) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
03/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1923. Dep: 19/11/1923. | ||
15/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1925. Dep: 22/12/1925. | ||
09/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1927. Dep: 25/11/1927. | ||
28/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
23/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1929. Dep: 12/11/1929. | ||
04/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1931. Dep: 09/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63) |
||
19/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1933. Dep: 26/10/1933. | ||
11/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 11/03/1935. Dep: 14/06/1935. | ||
14/06/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
08/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1937. Dep: 10/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1267 (Diagram 63) |
||
12/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1937. Dep: 24/08/1937. | ||
17/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
30/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 01/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
03/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/11/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941. | ||
26/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1942. Dep: 02/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
28/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/03/1944. Dep: 25/04/1944. | ||
19/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 117 (Diagram 63A) |
||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9857 | ||
21/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/11/1946. Dep: 06/12/1946. | ||
01/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/01/1948. Dep: 23/03/1948. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
03/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1948. Dep: 09/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3898 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69857 |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
20/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1951. Dep: 21/04/1951. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24708 (Diagram 63B) |
||
11/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24685 (Diagram 63B) |
||
12/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1953. Dep: 13/10/1953. | ||
12/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/08/1954. Dep: 23/09/1954. | ||
04/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/10/1956. Dep: 07/11/1956. | ||
22/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/11/1957. Dep: 06/12/1957. | ||
02/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
05/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69857 from Sunderland (52G) |