|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 22/09/1923 | 03/12/1923 | 73 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1925 | 25/09/1925 | 115 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1925 | 09/10/1925 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1927 | 07/10/1927 | 88 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1927 | 03/11/1927 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/07/1929 | 03/10/1929 | 70 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/11/1930 | 08/12/1930 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/11/1931 | 24/12/1931 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 2377 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1933 | 20/01/1934 | 38 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1936 | 13/03/1936 | 67 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1938 | 29/04/1938 | 53 days | General | Boiler number D1293 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1938 | 09/05/1938 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1940 | 20/06/1940 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24712 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1941 | 22/07/1941 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1943 | 29/01/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number D1102 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1946 | 01/02/1947 | 46 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2376 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1948 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1949 | 01/07/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2468 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69859 |
||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1951 | 29/09/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24716 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1951 | 10/10/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1951 | 19/10/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1954 | 28/10/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24736 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1956 | 23/10/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 24756 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1957 | 12/06/1957 | 23 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1957 | Sunderland MPD | This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. | SLS/195711 |
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2152 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Saltburn (SALT) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
22/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1923. Dep: 03/12/1923. | ||
03/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1925. Dep: 25/09/1925. | ||
30/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1925. Dep: 09/10/1925. | ||
12/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1927. Dep: 07/10/1927. | ||
19/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1927. Dep: 03/11/1927. | ||
28/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
26/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1929. Dep: 03/10/1929. | ||
10/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1930. Dep: 08/12/1930. | ||
06/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1931. Dep: 24/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2377 (Diagram 63) |
||
14/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1933. Dep: 20/01/1934. | ||
07/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 07/01/1936. Dep: 13/03/1936. | ||
29/05/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
08/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1938. Dep: 29/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1293 (Diagram 63) |
||
30/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1938. Dep: 09/05/1938. | ||
28/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1940. Dep: 20/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24712 (Diagram 63A) |
||
09/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1941. Dep: 22/07/1941. | ||
31/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1943. Dep: 29/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1102 (Diagram 63) |
||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9859 | ||
18/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1946. Dep: 01/02/1947. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2376 (Diagram 63) |
||
03/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/05/1948. | ||
31/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1949. Dep: 01/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2468 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69859 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
03/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1951. Dep: 29/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24716 (Diagram 63A) |
||
08/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1951. Dep: 10/10/1951. | ||
15/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1951. Dep: 19/10/1951. | ||
21/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
23/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1954. Dep: 28/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24736 (Diagram 63B) |
||
19/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1956. Dep: 23/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24756 (Diagram 63B) |
||
21/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/05/1957. Dep: 12/06/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
02/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
08/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69859 from Sunderland (52G) |