|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 14/04/1923 | 18/06/1923 | 66 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/06/1923 | 18/07/1923 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/05/1925 | 19/08/1925 | 87 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1928 | 27/06/1928 | 78 days | General | Boiler number D1022 (Diagram 63) |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/08/1929 | 21/08/1929 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 01/04/1930 | 28/05/1930 | 58 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/07/1930 | 22/07/1930 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1934 | 08/08/1934 | 99 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number D1067 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1934 | 17/08/1934 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1936 | 18/03/1936 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1938 | 19/02/1938 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1274 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1938 | 04/04/1938 | 42 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1939 | 14/10/1939 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1940 | 27/02/1940 | 34 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1943 | 06/11/1943 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3065 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1946 | 11/01/1947 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/08/1948 | 03/09/1948 | 19 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 69860 |
||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1949 | 17/06/1949 | 30 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1949 | 08/07/1949 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1951 | 15/12/1951 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24728 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1951 | 11/01/1952 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1954 | 22/05/1954 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1956 | 01/02/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24695 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1957 | 13/02/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Thornaby) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2153 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
14/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1923. Dep: 18/06/1923. | ||
25/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1923. Dep: 18/07/1923. | ||
25/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1925. Dep: 19/08/1925. | ||
11/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1928. Dep: 27/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1022 (Diagram 63) |
||
08/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1929. Dep: 21/08/1929. | ||
01/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1930. Dep: 28/05/1930. | ||
11/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/07/1930. Dep: 22/07/1930. | ||
02/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 02/05/1934. Dep: 08/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1067 (Diagram 63) |
||
08/08/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
13/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/08/1934. Dep: 17/08/1934. | ||
07/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1936. Dep: 18/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
17/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1274 (Diagram 63) |
||
22/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1938. Dep: 04/04/1938. | ||
20/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
01/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 63B) |
||
25/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/01/1940. Dep: 27/02/1940. | ||
23/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
24/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1943. Dep: 06/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3065 (Diagram 63B) |
||
29/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9860 | ||
26/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 63B) |
||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
16/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1948. Dep: 03/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69860 |
||
19/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1949. Dep: 17/06/1949. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C) |
||
28/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/06/1949. Dep: 08/07/1949. | ||
22/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24728 (Diagram 63B) |
||
27/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/12/1951. Dep: 11/01/1952. | ||
10/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B) |
||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
27/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1956. Dep: 01/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24695 (Diagram 63B) |
||
09/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1957. Dep: 13/02/1957. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
14/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69860 from Thornaby (51L) | ||
09/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |