Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 117 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4077 Week
» 33663 Month
» 407676 Year
» 1629241 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 2154 m/e 12/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9861   06/12/1946
British Railways 69861   06/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H112/1913
A823/08/1935
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1913 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 20/06/1960 off Malton (50F)
Scrapping During 08/1960
Service Life 46 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 20/6/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) m/e 12/1913
SUN Sunderland on 18/01/1939
CON Consett on 05/08/1946
SUN Sunderland on 20/01/1947
50G Whitby on 04/06/1950
50C Selby on 21/10/1951
50G Whitby on 11/05/1952
50F Malton on 03/06/1956
   Withdrawn on 20/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SUN Sunderland on 20/01/1947
ALLOC 50G Whitby m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 50C Selby w/e 27/10/1951
ALLOC 50G Whitby 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 50F Malton 4w/e 23/06/1956
TOSTORE   4w/e 24/01/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   on 20/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1913 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D280)
25/04/1928 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D294)
25/07/1930 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 1D/689)
30/05/1933 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1106)
19/10/1937 Diagram 63C boiler fitted (number 2822)
31/05/1943 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3369)
14/07/1947 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3362)
06/05/1950 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3986)
01/04/1958 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24747)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 11/02/1924 09/04/1924 59 days General  
Gateshead Works 06/02/1928 25/04/1928 80 days General
Boiler number D294 (Diagram 63)
 
Gateshead Works 26/08/1929 06/09/1929 12 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 02/06/1930 25/07/1930 54 days General
Boiler number 1D/689 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 27/04/1933 30/05/1933 34 days General
Boiler number D1106 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 31/05/1935 23/08/1935 85 days Rebuilding  
Darlington Works 31/08/1937 19/10/1937 50 days General
Boiler number 2822 (Diagram 63C)
 
Darlington Works 06/10/1938 19/10/1938 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/10/1939 17/11/1939 32 days General  
Darlington Works 22/12/1939 23/01/1940 33 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/05/1943 31/05/1943 29 days General
Boiler number 3369 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 03/03/1944 14/03/1944 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/02/1945 10/03/1945 32 days General  
Darlington Works 19/12/1945 05/02/1946 49 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 16/06/1947 14/07/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 24/07/1947 19/08/1947 27 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/09/1947 24/09/1947 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/10/1947 22/10/1947 22 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 04/04/1950 06/05/1950 33 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24729 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69861
 
Darlington Works 08/05/1950 11/05/1950 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/10/1951 08/12/1951 40 days General  
Darlington Works 14/07/1954 14/08/1954 32 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 13/07/1956 29/08/1956 48 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 21/02/1958 01/04/1958 40 days General
Boiler number 24747 (Diagram 63B)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1959 Class A8 4-6-2T (Selby) All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1913 To Service      
11/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1924. Dep: 09/04/1924.    
06/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1928. Dep: 25/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D294 (Diagram 63)
   
26/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1929. Dep: 06/09/1929.    
02/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1930. Dep: 25/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1D/689 (Diagram 63A)
   
27/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1933. Dep: 30/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1106 (Diagram 63)
   
31/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 31/05/1935. Dep: 23/08/1935.    
31/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1937. Dep: 19/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2822 (Diagram 63C)
   
06/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1938. Dep: 19/10/1938.    
18/01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN)    
17/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1939. Dep: 17/11/1939.    
22/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/12/1939. Dep: 23/01/1940.    
03/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1943. Dep: 31/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3369 (Diagram 63B)
   
03/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1944. Dep: 14/03/1944.    
07/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945.    
19/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1945. Dep: 05/02/1946.    
05/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (CON)    
06/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9861    
20/01/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN)    
16/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1947. Dep: 14/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 63B)
   
24/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/07/1947. Dep: 19/08/1947.    
16/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1947. Dep: 24/09/1947.    
01/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1947. Dep: 22/10/1947.    
04/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24729 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69861
   
08/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 11/05/1950.    
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (50G)    
21/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
30/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951.    
11/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (50G)    
14/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/07/1954. Dep: 14/08/1954.    
03/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Malton (50F)    
13/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/07/1956. Dep: 29/08/1956.    
21/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1958. Dep: 01/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24747 (Diagram 63B)
   
20/06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69861 from Malton (50F)    

prev prev