Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 270 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2835 Week
» 1573 Month
» 415894 Year
» 1637459 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 2155 m/e 02/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9862   11/08/1946
British Railways 69862   05/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H102/1914
A815/01/1933
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 02/1914 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Wed 30/07/1958 off Sunderland (54A)
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 30/7/58

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) m/e 02/1914
MID Middlesbrough on 02/12/1927
SALT Saltburn on 16/05/1929
HTN Heaton on 26/06/1930
DAR Darlington on 19/06/1934
WBY Whitby on 22/08/1934
NEV Neville Hill on 28/03/1942
WHL West Hartlepool on 07/11/1942
AUK West Auckland on 20/06/1945
WHL West Hartlepool on 26/11/1945
51E Stockton on 06/07/1952
51D Middlesbrough on 05/10/1952
51E Stockton on 21/06/1953
51D Middlesbrough on 20/09/1953
54A Sunderland on 15/09/1957
   Withdrawn on 30/07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   on 30/07/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1914 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D283)
24/06/1936 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1287)
20/04/1939 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2456)
11/07/1945 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2453)
05/11/1948 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3905)
06/04/1951 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24705)
01/05/1954 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24768)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 23/01/1923 12/04/1923 80 days General  
Gateshead Works 08/09/1925 15/01/1926 130 days General  
Gateshead Works 12/09/1927 18/10/1927 37 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 05/03/1928 25/05/1928 82 days General  
Darlington Works 16/09/1929 04/10/1929 19 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 27/06/1930 12/09/1930 78 days General
Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 10/08/1932 15/01/1933 159 days Rebuilding  
Darlington Works 20/07/1933 24/08/1933 36 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/03/1935 04/05/1935 53 days General  
Darlington Works 28/02/1936 24/06/1936 118 days Heavy
Boiler number D1287 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 30/11/1938 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 07/02/1939 20/04/1939 73 days General
Boiler number 2456 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 19/05/1939 01/06/1939 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/04/1942 06/06/1942 47 days General  
Darlington Works 11/05/1945 11/07/1945 62 days General
Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 29/03/1946 23/04/1946 26 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 24/11/1946 07/12/1946 14 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 07/10/1948 05/11/1948 30 days General
Boiler number 3905 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69862
 
Darlington Works 28/02/1951 06/04/1951 38 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24705 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 10/04/1951 13/04/1951 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/03/1954 01/05/1954 34 days General
Boiler number 24768 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 03/05/1954 04/05/1954 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/05/1954 14/05/1954 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/11/1956 12/12/1956 27 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901
31/10/1957 Sunderland MPD This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. SLS/195711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1914 To Service      
02/12/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
16/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
26/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
19/06/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
22/08/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (WBY)    
28/03/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
07/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
20/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK)    
26/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9862    
06/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
21/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
30/07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69862 from Sunderland (54A)    

prev prev