|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 26/04/1923 | 27/07/1923 | 93 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/02/1927 | 16/06/1927 | 112 days | General | Boiler number D290 (Diagram 63) |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/12/1929 | 12/02/1930 | 58 days | General | Boiler number D280 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1933 | 22/11/1933 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2466 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1935 | 05/09/1935 | 87 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1938 | 07/07/1938 | 45 days | General | Boiler number D1301 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1941 | 15/04/1941 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1941 | 12/02/1942 | 67 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1942 | 14/07/1942 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1942 | 12/08/1942 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1945 | 02/03/1945 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1293 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1947 | 07/11/1947 | 63 days | General | Boiler number D1219 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1950 | 25/03/1950 | 66 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24743 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69863 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1950 | 20/04/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1953 | 28/02/1953 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1955 | 30/06/1955 | 42 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24760 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1957 | 25/04/1957 | 50 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/09/1956 | Sunderland MPD | On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. | SLS/195611 |
04/05/1959 | Darlington area | The withdrawn engines at Fighting Cocks and on the Barnard Castle branch were still there on 4th May, except that the Broomielaw ones were observed in the scrap yard at Darlington. North Road station contained 62754, 69810/34/42/63/4. Sentinel 68150 (50C) arrived for scrap 6th May (last in Capital stock). | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/06/1902 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
02/1914 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2156 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
26/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1923. Dep: 27/07/1923. | ||
21/07/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
25/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1927. Dep: 16/06/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D290 (Diagram 63) |
||
17/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1929. Dep: 12/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D280 (Diagram 63) |
||
10/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1933. Dep: 22/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2466 (Diagram 63A) |
||
11/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 11/06/1935. Dep: 05/09/1935. | ||
30/09/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
24/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1938. Dep: 07/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1301 (Diagram 63) |
||
16/07/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
10/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
24/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/03/1941. Dep: 15/04/1941. | ||
08/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1941. Dep: 12/02/1942. | ||
07/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1942. Dep: 14/07/1942. | ||
28/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1942. Dep: 12/08/1942. | ||
01/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
25/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1945. Dep: 02/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1293 (Diagram 63) |
||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9863 | ||
06/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1947. Dep: 07/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1219 (Diagram 63) |
||
19/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1950. Dep: 25/03/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24743 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69863 |
||
17/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1950. Dep: 20/04/1950. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
28/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/01/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953. | ||
20/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1955. Dep: 30/06/1955. | ||
10/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24760 (Diagram 63B) |
||
07/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1957. Dep: 25/04/1957. | ||
03/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69863 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
02/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |