Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 229 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2794 Week
» 1532 Month
» 415853 Year
» 1637418 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 2156 m/e 02/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9863   17/11/1946
British Railways 69863   25/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H102/1914
A805/09/1935
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 02/1914 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 03/11/1958 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 44 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 3/11/58

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BLA Blaydon on 27/06/1902
GHD Gateshead (New) m/e 02/1914
HTN Heaton on 21/07/1926
GHD Gateshead on 30/09/1935
SKN Stockton on 16/07/1938
AUK West Auckland on 10/06/1940
WHL West Hartlepool on 01/02/1943
54A Sunderland on 06/07/1952
   Withdrawn on 03/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 12/07/1952
WDN   on 03/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1914 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D285)
16/06/1927 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D290)
12/02/1930 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D280)
22/11/1933 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2466)
07/07/1938 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1301)
02/03/1945 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1293)
07/11/1947 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1219)
25/03/1950 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3973)
08/10/1955 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24760)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 26/04/1923 27/07/1923 93 days General  
Gateshead Works 25/02/1927 16/06/1927 112 days General
Boiler number D290 (Diagram 63)
 
Gateshead Works 17/12/1929 12/02/1930 58 days General
Boiler number D280 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 10/10/1933 22/11/1933 44 days General
Boiler number 2466 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 11/06/1935 05/09/1935 87 days Rebuilding  
Darlington Works 24/05/1938 07/07/1938 45 days General
Boiler number D1301 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 24/03/1941 15/04/1941 23 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/12/1941 12/02/1942 67 days General  
Darlington Works 07/07/1942 14/07/1942 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/07/1942 12/08/1942 16 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/01/1945 02/03/1945 37 days General
Boiler number D1293 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 06/09/1947 07/11/1947 63 days General
Boiler number D1219 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 19/01/1950 25/03/1950 66 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24743 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69863
 
Darlington Works 17/04/1950 20/04/1950 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/01/1953 28/02/1953 32 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 20/05/1955 30/06/1955 42 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 10/09/1955 08/10/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 24760 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 07/03/1957 25/04/1957 50 days Heavy Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/06/1902 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
02/1914 To Service      
21/07/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
30/09/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
16/07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
10/06/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK)    
01/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9863    
06/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
03/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69863 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev