|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 11/04/1923 | 04/05/1923 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/09/1924 | 19/09/1924 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/05/1925 | 27/08/1925 | 115 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/02/1927 | 08/03/1927 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/11/1927 | 25/01/1928 | 83 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/04/1929 | 25/04/1929 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/04/1930 | 06/06/1930 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 5D/689 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/11/1931 | 08/01/1932 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1933 | 04/11/1933 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2465 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1934 | 09/11/1934 | 59 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1934 | 14/12/1934 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1936 | 14/07/1936 | 105 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1937 | 20/09/1937 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1938 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1939 | 04/08/1939 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 3046 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1942 | 18/07/1942 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 24745 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1943 | 15/12/1943 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 89 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/11/1946 | 22/11/1946 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1948 | 20/02/1948 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3069 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR E9867 |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/08/1949 | 14/10/1949 | 46 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 69867 |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1950 | 25/11/1950 | 26 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24689 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1950 | 29/11/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1952 | 13/08/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1952 | 29/12/1952 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1954 | 06/10/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24764 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1956 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (West Hartlepool) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1914 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2160 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
11/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1923. Dep: 04/05/1923. | ||
06/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1924. Dep: 19/09/1924. | ||
05/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1925. Dep: 27/08/1925. | ||
14/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/02/1927. Dep: 08/03/1927. | ||
04/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1927. Dep: 25/01/1928. | ||
10/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1929. Dep: 25/04/1929. | ||
21/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
10/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1930. Dep: 06/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5D/689 (Diagram 63A) |
||
26/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1931. Dep: 08/01/1932. | ||
05/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2465 (Diagram 63A) |
||
19/06/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duns (Twd) | ||
12/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1934. Dep: 09/11/1934. | ||
06/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1934. Dep: 14/12/1934. | ||
01/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 01/04/1936. Dep: 14/07/1936. | ||
14/07/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
06/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1937. Dep: 20/09/1937. | ||
04/07/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
05/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/10/1938. | ||
12/10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
21/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1939. Dep: 04/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3046 (Diagram 63B) |
||
08/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1942. Dep: 18/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24745 (Diagram 63B) |
||
03/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/11/1943. Dep: 15/12/1943. | ||
19/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. | ||
10/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9867 | ||
06/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1946. Dep: 22/11/1946. | ||
13/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1948. Dep: 20/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3069 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR E9867 |
||
17/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
23/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
30/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1949. Dep: 14/10/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69867 |
||
31/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24689 (Diagram 63B) |
||
27/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1950. Dep: 29/11/1950. | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
08/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
06/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1952. Dep: 13/08/1952. | ||
27/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/11/1952. Dep: 29/12/1952. | ||
09/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1954. Dep: 06/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24764 (Diagram 63B) |
||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
29/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
05/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/06/1956. | ||
23/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69867 from Scarborough (50E) | ||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |