|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 03/12/1923 | 13/02/1924 | 73 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/08/1925 | 27/10/1925 | 83 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/09/1927 | 12/01/1928 | 107 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/11/1929 | 22/11/1929 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/07/1931 | 19/08/1931 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1933 | 16/01/1934 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 5D/689 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1936 | 12/08/1936 | 86 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number 117 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1936 | 26/08/1936 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1939 | 22/06/1939 | 128 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1941 | 04/06/1941 | 58 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1943 | 10/02/1943 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 115 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1945 | 14/03/1945 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2465 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1947 | 19/07/1947 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 115 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/07/1947 | 30/07/1947 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1947 | 02/09/1947 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/09/1948 | 06/10/1948 | 16 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 69870 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1949 | 26/11/1949 | 29 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24724 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1951 | 31/10/1951 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1953 | 25/09/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24761 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1955 | 16/09/1955 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1957 | 28/09/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24710 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1957 | 02/10/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Borough Gardens) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1517 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
03/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1923. Dep: 13/02/1924. | ||
06/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1925. Dep: 27/10/1925. | ||
21/07/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
28/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1927. Dep: 12/01/1928. | ||
27/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
05/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/11/1929. Dep: 22/11/1929. | ||
06/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1931. Dep: 19/08/1931. | ||
06/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1933. Dep: 16/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5D/689 (Diagram 63A) |
||
12/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
19/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 19/05/1936. Dep: 12/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 117 (Diagram 63A) |
||
17/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1936. Dep: 26/08/1936. | ||
23/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
15/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1939. Dep: 22/06/1939. | ||
27/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
27/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
08/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1941. Dep: 04/06/1941. | ||
04/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1943. Dep: 10/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 115 (Diagram 63A) |
||
15/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/02/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. | ||
13/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1945. Dep: 14/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2465 (Diagram 63A) |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9870 | ||
19/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 115 (Diagram 63A) |
||
22/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1947. Dep: 30/07/1947. | ||
26/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/08/1947. Dep: 02/09/1947. | ||
21/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1948. Dep: 06/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69870 |
||
29/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24724 (Diagram 63B) |
||
03/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/10/1951. Dep: 31/10/1951. | ||
26/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. | ||
25/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1953. Dep: 25/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24761 (Diagram 63B) |
||
03/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/08/1955. Dep: 16/09/1955. | ||
30/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24710 (Diagram 63B) |
||
30/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/09/1957. Dep: 02/10/1957. | ||
22/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
24/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69870 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
08/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |