|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 08/12/1923 | 15/03/1924 | 99 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1924 | 07/10/1924 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1925 | 07/01/1926 | 101 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1927 | 30/08/1927 | 95 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1929 | 25/06/1929 | 62 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1929 | 11/07/1929 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1930 | 21/10/1930 | 55 days | General | Boiler number D1293 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1932 | 18/05/1933 | 239 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1933 | 13/09/1933 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1934 | 19/01/1934 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1934 | 24/09/1934 | 109 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1935 | 25/02/1935 | 55 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1935 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1935 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1936 | 18/04/1936 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1936 | 04/05/1936 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1936 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1937 | 11/02/1937 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1938 | 18/03/1938 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1938 | 03/05/1938 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1938 | 26/05/1938 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1940 | 16/05/1940 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1940 | 23/05/1940 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1941 | 01/07/1941 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1942 | 05/06/1942 | 65 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1943 | 08/01/1944 | 45 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3036 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1948 | 27/08/1948 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1949 | 05/08/1949 | 52 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24738 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69871 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1949 | 18/08/1949 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1952 | 31/05/1952 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1952 | 20/06/1952 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1955 | 12/03/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24717 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1955 | 26/03/1955 | 13 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1518 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
08/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1923. Dep: 15/03/1924. | ||
08/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1924. Dep: 07/10/1924. | ||
29/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1925. Dep: 07/01/1926. | ||
28/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1927. Dep: 30/08/1927. | ||
25/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1929. Dep: 25/06/1929. | ||
10/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1929. Dep: 11/07/1929. | ||
28/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1930. Dep: 21/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1293 (Diagram 63) |
||
22/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 22/09/1932. Dep: 18/05/1933. | ||
22/05/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
04/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1933. Dep: 13/09/1933. | ||
04/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/01/1934. Dep: 19/01/1934. | ||
08/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/06/1934. Dep: 24/09/1934. | ||
05/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
02/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/01/1935. Dep: 25/02/1935. | ||
06/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 06/06/1935. | ||
26/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 26/09/1935. | ||
02/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1936. Dep: 18/04/1936. | ||
21/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/04/1936. Dep: 04/05/1936. | ||
03/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/09/1936. | ||
07/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1937. Dep: 11/02/1937. | ||
05/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 18/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
22/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/04/1938. Dep: 03/05/1938. | ||
16/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/05/1938. Dep: 26/05/1938. | ||
17/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
15/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1940. Dep: 16/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B) |
||
20/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1940. Dep: 23/05/1940. | ||
16/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
24/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1941. Dep: 01/07/1941. | ||
02/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/04/1942. Dep: 05/06/1942. | ||
25/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/11/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 63B) |
||
01/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9871 | ||
06/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3036 (Diagram 63B) |
||
26/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 26/08/1948. Dep: 27/08/1948. | ||
15/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1949. Dep: 05/08/1949. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24738 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69871 |
||
11/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1949. Dep: 18/08/1949. | ||
08/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952. | ||
03/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1952. Dep: 20/06/1952. | ||
14/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1955. Dep: 12/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24717 (Diagram 63B) |
||
14/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955. | ||
02/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
11/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
07/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69871 from Darlington (51A) |