Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 85 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4045 Week
» 33631 Month
» 407644 Year
» 1629209 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 1519 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9872   30/08/1946
British Railways 69872   17/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H106/1920
A805/09/1934
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 06/1920 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Thu 16/10/1958 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 10/1958
Service Life 38 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 16/10/58

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) m/e 06/1920
DAR Darlington on 08/09/1934
SALT Saltburn on 10/04/1939
AUK West Auckland on 20/02/1949
54A Sunderland on 15/09/1957
   Withdrawn on 16/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AUK West Auckland w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   on 16/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1920 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1067)
03/10/1927 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D285)
02/04/1930 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 3D/689)
11/10/1935 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1316)
20/11/1936 Diagram 63C boiler fitted (number 2827)
21/03/1941 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3066)
27/06/1944 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3367)
30/08/1946 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3040)
17/12/1948 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3908)
23/09/1950 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 24682)
28/06/1952 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24683)
15/05/1954 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24762)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 26/09/1923 28/11/1923 64 days General  
Gateshead Works 12/05/1925 13/08/1925 94 days General  
Gateshead Works 04/07/1927 03/10/1927 92 days General
Boiler number D285 (Diagram 63)
 
Gateshead Works 12/03/1929 17/05/1929 67 days General  
Gateshead Works 03/06/1929 18/06/1929 16 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 26/02/1931 02/04/1931 36 days General  
Gateshead Works 16/04/1931 23/04/1931 8 days Painting
Returned to be painted
 
Darlington Works 12/12/1932 31/01/1933 51 days General  
Darlington Works 23/04/1934 05/09/1934 136 days Rebuilding  
Darlington Works 26/08/1935 11/10/1935 47 days General
Boiler number D1316 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 23/09/1936 20/11/1936 59 days General
Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C)
 
Darlington Works 08/12/1936 09/12/1936 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/05/1937 22/06/1937 34 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/10/1938 26/11/1938 47 days General  
Darlington Works 14/02/1939 28/02/1939 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/10/1939 23/10/1939 22 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 10/07/1940 22/08/1940 44 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 10/02/1941 21/03/1941 40 days General
Boiler number 3066 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 21/09/1942 22/10/1942 32 days General  
Darlington Works 13/01/1943 22/01/1943 10 days Unclassified
War damage collision with aircraft at Dinsdale
 
Darlington Works 02/06/1944 27/06/1944 26 days General
Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 02/08/1944 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 17/11/1945 21/12/1945 35 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 29/06/1946 30/08/1946 63 days General
Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9872
 
Darlington Works 17/12/1946 1 day Weighing  
Gateshead Works 01/10/1947 16/10/1947 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 11/11/1948 17/12/1948 37 days General
Boiler number 3908 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69872
 
Darlington Works 17/08/1950 23/09/1950 38 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24682 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 28/09/1950 17/10/1950 20 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 26/05/1952 28/06/1952 34 days General
Boiler number 24683 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 07/07/1952 09/07/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/04/1954 15/05/1954 25 days General
Boiler number 24762 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 17/05/1954 22/05/1954 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/02/1955 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 13/01/1956 08/02/1956 27 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 02/05/1956 12/06/1956 42 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 22/06/1956 26/06/1956 5 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1957 Sunderland MPD This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. SLS/195711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service      
26/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1923. Dep: 28/11/1923.    
12/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1925. Dep: 13/08/1925.    
04/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1927. Dep: 03/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D285 (Diagram 63)
   
12/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1929. Dep: 17/05/1929.    
03/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1929. Dep: 18/06/1929.    
02/04/1930 Modification Diagram 63A number 3D/689 boiler fitted    
26/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1931. Dep: 02/04/1931.    
16/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Painting) - Arr: 16/04/1931. Dep: 23/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Returned to be painted
   
12/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1932. Dep: 31/01/1933.    
23/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 23/04/1934. Dep: 05/09/1934.    
08/09/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
26/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1935. Dep: 11/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1316 (Diagram 63)
   
23/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1936. Dep: 20/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C)
   
08/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1936. Dep: 09/12/1936.    
20/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1937. Dep: 22/06/1937.    
11/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938.    
14/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1939. Dep: 28/02/1939.    
10/04/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
02/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1939. Dep: 23/10/1939.    
10/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/07/1940. Dep: 22/08/1940.    
10/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1941. Dep: 21/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3066 (Diagram 63B)
   
21/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1942. Dep: 22/10/1942.    
13/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/01/1943. Dep: 22/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
War damage collision with aircraft at Dinsdale
   
02/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1944. Dep: 27/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 63B)
   
02/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/08/1944.    
17/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 21/12/1945.    
29/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1946. Dep: 30/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9872
   
17/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 17/12/1946.    
01/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/10/1947. Dep: 16/10/1947.    
11/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1948. Dep: 17/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3908 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69872
   
20/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK)    
17/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1950. Dep: 23/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24682 (Diagram 63A)
   
28/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/09/1950. Dep: 17/10/1950.    
26/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1952. Dep: 28/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24683 (Diagram 63B)
   
07/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1952. Dep: 09/07/1952.    
21/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1954. Dep: 15/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24762 (Diagram 63B)
   
17/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/05/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954.    
17/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 17/02/1955.    
13/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/01/1956. Dep: 08/02/1956.    
02/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/05/1956. Dep: 12/06/1956.    
22/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1956. Dep: 26/06/1956.    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
16/10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69872 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev