Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 110 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4070 Week
» 33656 Month
» 407669 Year
» 1629234 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 1520 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9873   06/04/1946
British Railways 69873   13/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H106/1920
A808/04/1935
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 06/1920 to Starbeck (SBK)
Withdrawal Mon 08/02/1960 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 39 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 8/2/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SBK Starbeck (New) m/e 06/1920
NEV Neville Hill on 14/08/1926
SCA Scarborough on 22/05/1935
HLB Hull Botanic Gardens on 02/12/1935
MID Middlesbrough on 12/09/1948
53B Hull Botanic Gardens on 04/06/1950
51D Middlesbrough on 19/11/1950
51C West Hartlepool on 17/07/1955
54a Durham on 15/09/1957
52G Sunderland on 07/12/1958
   Withdrawn on 08/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MID Middlesbrough w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC DUR   4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 27/12/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   w/e 08/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1920 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1022)
29/10/1927 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D269)
03/07/1929 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D252)
30/10/1931 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number 2376)
17/05/1940 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3065)
03/07/1943 Diagram 63C boiler fitted (number 2822)
13/08/1948 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3067)
10/02/1951 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 24698)
15/01/1954 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 24707)
14/09/1956 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24765)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 20/10/1923 12/01/1924 85 days General  
Darlington Works 12/06/1924 07/07/1924 26 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 16/04/1925 17/07/1925 93 days General  
Darlington Works 21/08/1925 18/09/1925 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 24/11/1925 30/12/1925 37 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 16/07/1927 29/10/1927 106 days General
Boiler number D269 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 29/04/1929 03/07/1929 66 days General
Boiler number D252 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 08/09/1931 30/10/1931 53 days General
Boiler number 2376 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 17/08/1933 21/09/1933 36 days General  
Darlington Works 17/01/1935 08/04/1935 82 days Rebuilding  
Darlington Works 01/02/1937 19/03/1937 47 days General  
Darlington Works 18/04/1940 17/05/1940 30 days General
Boiler number 3065 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 27/03/1941 15/04/1941 20 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 07/06/1943 03/07/1943 27 days General
Boiler number 2822 (Diagram 63C)
 
Gateshead Works 21/11/1944 08/12/1944 18 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 11/02/1946 06/04/1946 55 days General
Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9873
 
Gateshead Works 09/03/1947 22/03/1947 14 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 28/03/1947 03/04/1947 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/06/1948 13/08/1948 54 days General
Boiler number 3067 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69873
 
Darlington Works 17/08/1948 21/08/1948 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/01/1951 10/02/1951 32 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24698 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 13/02/1951 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/05/1951 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 02/07/1951 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 07/01/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 10/03/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 16/04/1952 02/05/1952 17 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 12/05/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 09/09/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 04/11/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 04/02/1953 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 05/05/1953 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 10/11/1953 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 09/12/1953 15/01/1954 38 days General
Boiler number 24707 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 10/08/1956 14/09/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 24765 (Diagram 63B)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810
31/10/1957 Sunderland MPD This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. SLS/195711
13/12/1958 Durham MPD This shed (sub to Sunderland) was closed as from 13th December, 1958, and its two remaining A8s 69873/83 transferred to store at Sunderland. Banking at Durham is now performed by a V1/3 which comes daily from Sunderland. SLS/195902
31/05/1959 Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service      
20/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1923. Dep: 12/01/1924.    
12/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1924. Dep: 07/07/1924.    
16/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1925. Dep: 17/07/1925.    
21/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1925. Dep: 18/09/1925.    
24/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1925. Dep: 30/12/1925.    
14/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
16/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D269 (Diagram 63)
   
29/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1929. Dep: 03/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D252 (Diagram 63)
   
08/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1931. Dep: 30/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2376 (Diagram 63)
   
17/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1933. Dep: 21/09/1933.    
17/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 17/01/1935. Dep: 08/04/1935.    
22/05/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA)    
02/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB)    
01/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1937. Dep: 19/03/1937.    
18/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1940. Dep: 17/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3065 (Diagram 63B)
   
27/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/03/1941. Dep: 15/04/1941.    
07/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2822 (Diagram 63C)
   
21/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/11/1944. Dep: 08/12/1944.    
11/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9873
   
09/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947.    
28/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1947. Dep: 03/04/1947.    
21/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3067 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69873
   
17/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948.    
12/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
19/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
10/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24698 (Diagram 63A)
   
13/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1951.    
22/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/05/1951.    
02/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/07/1951.    
07/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/01/1952.    
10/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/03/1952.    
16/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1952. Dep: 02/05/1952.    
12/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 12/05/1952.    
09/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 09/09/1952.    
04/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 04/11/1952.    
04/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 04/02/1953.    
05/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/05/1953.    
10/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/11/1953.    
09/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1953. Dep: 15/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24707 (Diagram 63A)
   
17/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
10/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1956. Dep: 14/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24765 (Diagram 63B)
   
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Durham (54a)    
07/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
08/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69873 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev