Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 260 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2825 Week
» 1563 Month
» 415884 Year
» 1637449 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 1523 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9874   07/07/1946
British Railways 69874   25/08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H106/1920
A825/04/1935
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 06/1920 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Fri 20/05/1960 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 06/1960
Service Life 39 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 20/5/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) m/e 06/1920
BLA Blaydon on 27/06/1928
HTN Heaton on 12/07/1934
WBY Whitby on 22/05/1935
SBK Starbeck on 26/02/1940
SUN Sunderland on 28/06/1943
   Withdrawn on 20/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   on 20/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1920 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1019)
27/04/1931 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D289)
26/04/1933 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2456)
19/05/1939 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2457)
21/10/1943 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2458)
12/12/1947 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1251)
25/08/1950 Diagram 63C boiler fitted (number 2824)
28/11/1952 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24735)
02/04/1955 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24732)
18/10/1957 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24711)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 15/11/1923 01/02/1924 79 days General  
Gateshead Works 03/07/1925 21/09/1925 81 days General  
Gateshead Works 21/10/1925 03/11/1925 14 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 07/03/1927 16/06/1927 102 days General  
Gateshead Works 13/01/1929 28/03/1929 75 days General  
Gateshead Works 12/03/1931 27/04/1931 47 days General
Boiler number D289 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 07/03/1933 26/04/1933 51 days General
Boiler number 2456 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 04/02/1935 25/04/1935 81 days Rebuilding  
Darlington Works 15/02/1939 19/05/1939 94 days General
Boiler number 2457 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 14/06/1939 17/07/1939 34 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/10/1942 09/11/1942 21 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 20/09/1943 21/10/1943 32 days General
Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 28/11/1945 12/01/1946 46 days General
Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 12/11/1947 12/12/1947 31 days General
Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 09/01/1948 20/01/1948 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/07/1950 25/08/1950 45 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 2824 (Diagram 63C)
Renumbered to BR 69874
 
Darlington Works 03/11/1952 28/11/1952 26 days General
Boiler number 24735 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 09/03/1955 02/04/1955 25 days General
Boiler number 24732 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 04/04/1955 07/04/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/09/1957 18/10/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 24711 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 12/11/1957 18/11/1957 7 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1959 Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service      
27/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
12/07/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
22/05/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (WBY)    
26/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK)    
28/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN)    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9874    
20/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69874 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev