Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 318 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2883 Week
» 1621 Month
» 415942 Year
» 1637507 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 1528 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9875   14/07/1946
British Railways 69875   07/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H106/1920
A803/01/1933
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 06/1920 to Starbeck (SBK)
Withdrawal Fri 20/05/1960 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 06/1960
Service Life 39 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 20/5/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SBK Starbeck (New) m/e 06/1920
DAR Darlington on 29/05/1934
SALT Saltburn on 10/04/1939
AUK West Auckland on 20/02/1949
54A Sunderland on 22/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 20/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AUK West Auckland w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 14/07/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   on 20/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1920 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1091)
08/12/1930 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1063)
03/01/1933 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2458)
14/03/1939 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1313)
23/10/1941 Diagram 63C boiler fitted (number 2827)
23/02/1946 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2458)
21/06/1950 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3362)
23/08/1952 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 24690)
23/11/1954 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 24716)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 05/11/1923 07/02/1924 95 days General  
Darlington Works 21/05/1925 11/09/1925 114 days General  
Darlington Works 16/06/1927 09/09/1927 86 days General  
Darlington Works 14/03/1929 24/05/1929 72 days General  
Darlington Works 20/10/1930 08/12/1930 50 days General
Boiler number D1063 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 22/12/1930 31/12/1930 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/06/1932 03/01/1933 211 days Rebuilding
Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 13/02/1935 05/04/1935 52 days General  
Darlington Works 19/10/1936 24/12/1936 67 days General  
Darlington Works 30/12/1936 12/01/1937 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/11/1938 14/03/1939 114 days General
Boiler number D1313 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 30/03/1939 20/04/1939 22 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/04/1939 04/05/1939 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/09/1941 23/10/1941 39 days General
Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C)
 
Darlington Works 31/10/1941 10/11/1941 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/01/1944 19/02/1944 30 days General
Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 23/02/1944 02/03/1944 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/05/1945 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 31/07/1945 03/09/1945 35 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 23/01/1946 23/02/1946 32 days General
Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 06/12/1946 16/12/1946 11 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 27/03/1947 19/04/1947 24 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/02/1948 07/04/1948 55 days General
Renumbered to BR 69875
 
Darlington Works 29/04/1948 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 22/05/1950 21/06/1950 31 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 14/07/1952 23/08/1952 41 days General
Boiler number 24690 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 02/06/1954 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 20/10/1954 23/11/1954 35 days General
Boiler number 24716 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 25/09/1956 02/11/1956 39 days General
Boiler number 24724 (Diagram 63B)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806
31/05/1959 Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service      
29/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
10/04/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
14/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9875    
20/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK)    
22/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
20/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69875 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev